Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Clayton, Danette, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ross, Desiree, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with David C. Kalemkarian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid C. Kalemkarian Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time1420 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Hearing
Judge: Kalemkarian, David |
|
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure | |
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration for Default or Uncontested Disso or Legal Sep | |
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default | |
July 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judge Kalemkarian Minute Order. See Attached HRG: 7/23/2019 Judicial Officer: D Kalemkarian Dept: 202 Clerk: L. Garvin Bailiff: A. Rivera Reporter: Not Reported Petitioner: Not present Respondent: Not present You are hereby ordered to appear in Department 202 on 1/29/2020 at 11:00 a.m., to show cause why the above-referenced case should not be dismissed. California law requires that Family Law matters proceed in an effective and timely manner from initial filing to final disposition. (Fam. Code 2450, subd. (a), and Standards of Judicial Administration, standard 5.30.) In deciding whether a case is progressing in an effective and timely manner, the Court considers procedural milestones, including the following: (A) A proof of service of summons and petition should be filed within 60 days of case initiation; (B) If no response has been filed, and the parties have not agreed on an extension of time to respond, a request to enter default should be submitted within 60 days after the date the response was due; (C) The petitioner's preliminary declaration of disclosure should be served within 60 days of the filing of the petition; (D) When a default has been entered, a judgment should be submitted within 60 days of the entry of default; (E) Whether a trial date has been requested or scheduled; and (F) When the parties have notified the court that they are actively negotiating or mediating their case, a written agreement for judgment is submitted within six months of the date the petition was filed, or a request for trial date is submitted. (Cal. Rule of Court, rule 5.83(c) (4).) The Court has reason to believe that the above-referenced case is not progressing in an effective and timely manner. |
|
July 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
2 Family - Centered Status Conference
Judge: Kalemkarian, David |
|
June 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
2 Family - Centered Status Conference
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
June 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judge Tharpe Minute Order. See attached. HRG: 6/20/2018 Judicial Officer: D. Tharpe Dept: 202 Clerk: Mp Vang Bailiff: J Espinoza Petitioner present pro per Respondent not present Continued to: Next family centered case status conference Date: 7/23/2019 Time: 9:30a.m. Dept: 202 Petitioner is present and have been assisted by a staff from the Self-Help Center. The matter is not called on the record. Matter continued for further case status conference. |
|
February 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judge Tharpe Minute Order. See attached. Hrg: 2/15/2017 Judicial Officer: D. Tharpe Dept: 202 Clerk: MP Vang Bailiff: Harley Petitioner present pro per Respondent not present Continued to: Next family centered case status conference Date: 12/26/17 Time: 10:30a.m. Dept: 202 Petitioner is present and have been assisted by a staff from the Self-Help Center. The matter is not called on the record. Matter continued for further case status conference. Petitioner to notify the Respondent. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.