Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
James, Linda Kay, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against James, Edward, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with D. Tyler Tharpe presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeD. Tyler Tharpe Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time433 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
2 Family - Centered Status Conference
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
March 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Marital Status Ends: 03/06/17. |
|
March 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Waiver Filed FAMILY CODE SECTION 2105 WAIVER |
|
March 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Declaration for Default or Uncontested Disso or Legal Sep | |
March 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Declaration regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure | |
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default | |
September 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judge Tharpe Minute Order. See attached. Minute order from Dept: 202 Clerk: DCruz Reporter: NR Nature of Hearing: Family Centered Case Status Minute Order Petitioner: Present Respondent: Present Next family centered case resolution conference is set for: 7/18/17 at 10:30 am in D202 Other: Petitioner and Respondent was present and have been assisted by a staff from the Self-Help Center. Parties have not reached an agreement. The matter is not called on the record. Matter continued for further case status conference. Minute orders are given to both parties. |
|
September 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
1 Family - Centered Status Conference
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
June 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons | |
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Judge Tharpe Minute Order. See attached. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.