Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
S & B Investments, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Levitt, Donald R, against Federico Career Colleges, Inc., Federico, Linda, Federico, Samuel B., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Snauffer, Mark presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSnauffer, Mark Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management124 days |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2015 |
Category06 Unlimited - Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions230 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time380 days |
Filed Stipulation for Commissioner Dalesandro
Date: November 17, 2017Minute Order Attachment
Date: April 21, 2017Request for Court Judgment
Date: December 12, 2016Order to Show Cause - Pre
Date: February 16, 2017Request Filed
Date: October 13, 2016Minute Order Attachment
Date: September 06, 2016Request for Exemption from Electronic Filing and Service
Date: August 02, 2016Minute Order Attachment
Date: November 17, 2017Application and Order for Examination
Date: August 15, 2017Application and Order for Examination
Date: March 03, 2017Request for Court Judgment
Date: December 12, 2016Request for Court Judgment
Date: December 12, 2016Minute Order Attachment
Date: November 07, 2016Order of Exemption from Electronic Filing and Service
Date: August 10, 2016Minute Order Attachment
Date: July 05, 2016Minute Order Attachment
Date: May 02, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Filed Stipulation for Commissioner Dalesandro | |
November 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
November 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order of Examination Donald Levitt Judge: Dalesandro, Samuel |
|
August 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Application & Order to Appearance and Examination |
|
August 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Return filed Return of (Order to Appear for Examination ck# 0607 $60.00) Duplicate filing |
|
August 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Application and Order for Examination Of Judgment Debtor or Third Person filed. |
|
April 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
April 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order of Examination Donald Levitt Judge: Dalesandro, Samuel |
|
March 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Application and Order for Examination Of Judgment Debtor or Third Person filed. |
|
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Return filed Return of (Application and Order for Appearance and Examination ck# 06003 $60.00) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.