Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Cypress Insurance Company, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Javan, Robert B., against Angelique, Kathleen, represented by Allard-Bernhardt, Victoria R., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Kristi Culver presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKristi Culver Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management124 days |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2015 |
Category23 Unlimited - Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Time To Trial607 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time580 days |
Minute Order Attachment
Date: May 02, 2016Case Management Statement Filed
Date: April 20, 2016Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: July 28, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Requested by both with an estimated time of 5 days Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
August 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Snauffer, Mark |
|
August 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference | |
July 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review | |
July 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Acknowledgement of Satisfaction of Judgment Full Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed |
|
July 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed of acceptance of offer to compromise |
|
September 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address Filed | |
July 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing Re: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information |
|
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
OSC - ADR Stipulation
Judge: Ikeda, Dale |
|
May 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Stipulation ADR Stipulation Mediation filed Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: Lee M. Jacobsen |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.