Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bee Sweet Citrus, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Weiland, David J., against Valley Packline Solutions, Inc., represented by Cook, Russell D., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Snauffer, Mark presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSnauffer, Mark Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management124 days |
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2015 |
Category06 Unlimited - Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Time To Trial628 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time546 days |
Minute Order Attachment
Date: February 01, 2016ADR Stipulation Mediation filed
Date: March 24, 2016Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: March 29, 2017Stipulation Filed
Date: March 27, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Requested by Plaintiff with estimated time of 5-7 days. Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
June 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Snauffer, Mark |
|
May 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference | |
March 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Full Dismissal Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review |
|
March 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Stipulation Filed Stipulation to dismiss action without prejudice and stipulation to extend statute of limitations (no order attached) |
|
April 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
OSC - ADR Stipulation
Judge: Ikeda, Dale |
|
March 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
ADR Stipulation Mediation filed Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: James A. Dilling |
|
March 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed of action pursuant to labor code section 3853 |
|
February 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
February 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Jury Requested by Party estimated time of 5-7 days. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.