Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
The State Of California, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case represented by Yan, Elaine W, against Fidelity National Title Company, Johns, Amalia, Johns, Charles W., Johns, Jeffrey Jay, represented by Gordon, Jared, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Simpson, Alan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSimpson, Alan Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 13, 2015 |
Category14 Unlimited - Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation |
Time To Trial628 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions672 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time691 days |
Stipulation Filed
Date: October 27, 2016Minute Order Attachment
Date: September 14, 2015Minute Order Attachment
Date: November 19, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
November 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Dismissal
Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
October 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed OF ELAINE W. YAN RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL |
|
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing OSC re: Dismissal Hearing set |
|
August 28, 2017 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 After Settlement | |
June 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Notice Filed Notice of Entry of Final Order for Condemnation |
|
May 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Civil Document Order filed Final Order of Condemnation Judge: Simpson, Alan |
|
May 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Simpson, Alan |
|
May 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Received for Signature PENDING REVIEW Forwarded to Dept. 503 Forwarded to 4th Floor Clerk's office for further processing Order for: Proposed Final Order of Condemnation |
|
May 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed Declaration of Elaine W. Yan in Support of Final Order of Condemnation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.