Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
King, Lindsey, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Vandergrift, Julianne, against Gill, Vanessa, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Sandra L. McLean presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSandra L. McLean Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management184 days |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2012 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time233 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
OSC hearing Desc: OSC: WHY COURT SHOULD NOT DISMISS CASE Desc2: FOR FAILTURE TO PROSECUTE OR SERVE Disp Code: 937 - OFF-CALENDAR/DISMISSAL FILED Disp Clerk: SWB Filing Clerk: DMY Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
July 22, 2013 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB | |
July 22, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON CHICO SUPERIOR COURT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB | |
July 22, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB | |
July 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: NTC OF PROOF OF MAILING ORDER SHOW CAUSE & MINUTE ORDER 6/28/13 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DMY |
|
July 02, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HON. SANDRA L. MCLEAN; JUDGE (C13) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DMY | |
June 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Desc: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Disp Code: 399 - OSC ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF Disp Clerk: DMY Filing Clerk: MMC Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMC | |
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMC | |
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference NTC OF ASSIGNMENT & CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.