Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Ca Victim Compensation Claims, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Britton, Robert L, Britton, Janet, Britton Family Trust Created 2009, Britton, Robert L, 2000 Trust, Britton, Robert L, Estate Of, (total of 6) See All represented by Dewart, John W, Schaller, John C, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Sandra L. McLean presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSandra L. McLean Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management184 days |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2012 |
Category(23) Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL WITH PROOF OF SERVICE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: PBP | |
April 09, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JMS | |
April 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing Desc: STATUS OF PROOF OF DEPOSIT OF FUNDS Disp Code: 331 - RECEIPTS RECEIVED; DISMISSAL FILED Disp Clerk: JMS Filing Clerk: JMS Judge: Glusman, Robert A |
|
April 04, 2014 | Docket Event | RECEIPT & ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF THE ORDER FOR THE DEPOSIT OF MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: PBP | |
February 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF HEARING Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: PBP |
|
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT DB NO COPIES Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JMS | |
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Petition Hearing Desc: PETN FOR COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OF Desc2: MINOR DB Disp Code: 340 - GRANTED Disp Clerk: JMS Filing Clerk: JMS Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION MINOR DB Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JMS | |
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION MINOR CB Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JMS | |
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Desc: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Desc2: ** SPECIAL SET ** Desc3: CONT FROM 2/4/14 Disp Code: 937 - OFF-CALENDAR Disp Clerk: JMS Filing Clerk: KLD Judge: Glusman, Robert A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.