Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Alicia, Matthew Eric Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2009 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedMarch 25, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Failure to Pay MSB | |
November 29, 2011 | Docket Event | Franchise Tax Board Court Ordered Debt Program | |
November 03, 2011 | Docket Event | Civil Assessment Failure To Pay | |
October 19, 2011 | Docket Event | Failure to Pay Letter | |
October 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Failure to Pay | |
August 03, 2011 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
August 03, 2011 | Docket Event | DMV Failure to Appear Release | |
August 03, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Dismissed | |
March 26, 2009 | Docket Event | DMV Hold | |
March 26, 2009 | Docket Event | DMV Failure to Appear Abstract |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.