Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Naval, Sylvia Julie, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Meredith, Lynne R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMeredith, Lynne R Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2008 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions4321 days |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
|
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Case Cycle Time4321 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event | *Collections: Completed | |
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event | DMV Failure to Appear Release on Dismissals | |
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Arraignment Held | |
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Dismissed | |
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Meredith, Lynne R |
|
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
October 23, 2020 | Docket Event | *Collections: Updated Information | |
November 12, 2013 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear MSB | |
March 23, 2009 | Docket Event | Civil Assessment Failure To Appear |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.