Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Bali, Navdeep, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 17, 2009 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedMarch 27, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Destroyed | |
April 09, 2009 | Docket Event | Abstract | |
April 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
April 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Date of Payment | |
April 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Trial by Declaration | |
March 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
February 17, 2009 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
December 29, 2008 | Docket Event | Citation Filed | |
December 29, 2008 | Docket Event | Citation | |
December 12, 2008 | Docket Event | Citation Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.