Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Credit Bureau Of Santa Maria Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Weare, Heather M, against Michel, Nelson, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Beebe, Jed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeebe, Jed Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 06, 2015 |
Category09-Contract - Collections - Civil (Limited) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions62 days |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time62 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment, Filed | |
March 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution, Returned | |
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution, Issued | |
May 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration, Filed | |
May 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes, Filed | |
May 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Default Judgment by Clerk, Filed | |
May 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default, Filed | |
April 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed | |
April 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service 30 Day Summons and Complaint | |
March 11, 2015 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.