Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Credit Bureau Of Santa Maria Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Weare, Heather M, against Cruz, Edgar, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Staffel, Timothy J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStaffel, Timothy J Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 13, 2012 |
Category09-Contract - Collections - Civil (Limited) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions124 days |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time124 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment, Filed | |
June 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution, Issued | |
November 14, 2012 | Docket Event | Declaration, Filed | |
November 14, 2012 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes, Filed | |
November 14, 2012 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment, Filed | |
November 14, 2012 | Docket Event | Default Judgment by Clerk, Filed | |
November 14, 2012 | Docket Event | Summons | |
August 14, 2012 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed | |
July 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed | |
July 13, 2012 | Docket Event | Conversion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.