Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Credit Bureau Of Santa Maria Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Weare, Heather M, against Martinez, Esperanza, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Rigali, James F presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRigali, James F Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 09, 2012 |
Category09-Contract - Collections - Civil (Limited) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions56 days |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time56 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution, Issued | |
May 04, 2012 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes, Filed | |
May 04, 2012 | Docket Event | Default Judgment by Clerk, Filed | |
May 04, 2012 | Docket Event | Summons | |
May 04, 2012 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment, Filed | |
May 04, 2012 | Docket Event | Declaration, Filed | |
April 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed | |
March 14, 2012 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed | |
March 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Conversion | |
March 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.