Case Last Refreshed: 4 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) Civil case against Gary Alan Bixler, in the jurisdiction of Monterey County. This case was filed in Monterey County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 18, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 18, 2019 |
|
Filing LocationMonterey County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2019 | Action | Conversion - JBSIS DO NOT COUNT | |
July 28, 2014 | Action | Notice | |
July 24, 2014 | Action | DD1: Abstract of Conviction Reported | |
July 16, 2014 | Action | Certificate: Traffic School | |
May 08, 2014 | Action | Notice | |
March 18, 2014 | Action | Citation: Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.