We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 1 hour ago
City Of Los Angeles ,
filed a(n)
Civil (Limited Jurisdiction)
case
against
Bird Ruth ,
in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County.
This case was filed in
Los Angeles County
Superior Courts
Superior.
Filing Date
July 02, 2013
Category
Civil (Limited Jurisdiction)
Last Refreshed
April 25, 2024
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Case Events for
City Of Los Angeles v. Bird Ruth
Date
Type
Description
July 02, 2031
Docket Event
APPEAL FROM ADMINISTRATIVE DECISION
July 02, 2031
Docket Event
PARKING APPEAL FILED
February 08, 2024
Docket Event
** Filing Date changed from to
August 29, 2013
Docket Event
NOTICE OF DECISION-ADMINISTRATIVE APPEAL NOTICE OF DECISION-ADMINISTRATIVE APPEAL AFFIRMED.
August 29, 2013
Docket Event
Notice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Get Document
August 29, 2013
Docket Event
NOTICE OF DECISION-ADMINISTRATIVE APPEAL NOTICE OF DECISION-ADMINISTRATIVE APPEAL AFFIRMED.
August 12, 2013
Docket Event
NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED TRIAL TIME TO 8:30 A.M. FILED AND MAILED
July 17, 2013
Docket Event
CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED-REQUEST FOR ADMINISTRATIVE FILE
July 17, 2013
Docket Event
HEARING DATE SET FOR , 01:30 PM, DEPT 77
July 17, 2013
Docket Event
HEARING DATE SET FOR 08/29/13, 01:30 PM, DEPT 77
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.