Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ferguson Enterprises, Inc, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Sykulski, George, against Lomarey, Inc, Sycamore Ventures, Lcc, represented by Ensminger, D Randall, Spiering, Swartz & Kennedy, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Roberts, Barbara presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRoberts, Barbara Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management182 days |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
Category(26) Unlimited Other Real Property |
Time To Trial409 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Case Cycle Time1928 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2012 | Docket Event | CASE FILE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GC 68152 AND STANDING ORDER BCSC 2006-SO-05 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMC | |
February 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Desc: COURT TRIAL Disp Code: 947 - VACATE/REPORTED SETTLED Disp Clerk: SWB Filing Clerk: LBC Judge: Roberts, Barbara L |
|
January 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Desc: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Desc2: RE DISMISSAL/NO APPEARANCE NECESSARY IF Desc3: DISMISSAL FILED Notice Date: 2007-11-08 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 937 - OFF-CALENDAR; DISMISSAL FILED Disp Clerk: VLA Filing Clerk: SWB Judge: Roberts, Barbara L |
|
December 03, 2007 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: VLA | |
November 21, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF RULING RE PLTFS MOTION TO COMPEL RESP TO REQUEST FOR ADMISS OF FACT & TO DEMAND... Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB |
|
November 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment Hearing (Predisposition) Desc: [P] MOT: SUMMARY JUDGMENT &/OR SUMMARY Desc2: ADJUDICATION Disp Code: 937 - OFF-CALENDAR REPORTED SETTLED Disp Clerk: SWB Filing Clerk: SWB Judge: Roberts, Barbara L |
|
November 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE RE DISMISSAL/NO APPEARANCE NECESSARY IF Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB |
|
November 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB |
|
October 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Motion hearings - Predispo Desc: [P] MOT: COMPEL ANS TO INTERROG/SANCTION Desc2: CONT FROM 09/07/07 Disp Code: 937 - OFF-CALENDAR/CAL'D IN ERROR Disp Clerk: MMC Filing Clerk: SWB Judge: Roberts, Barbara L |
|
October 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Motion hearings - Predispo Desc: [P] MOT: COMPEL RESP TO DEMAND TO PROD Desc2: DOCUMENTS, PRODUCTION OF DOCS, & FOR Desc3: SANCTIONS AGAINST ATTY/DEFT Disp Code: 340 - GRANTED Disp Clerk: JMN Filing Clerk: SWB Judge: Roberts, Barbara L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.