Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Oak Ridge Cabinets, filed a(n) Pre-Jbsis Civil Limited case represented by Mendelson, Lee M, against Pascuiti, Albert R, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Barbara L. Roberts presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarbara L. Roberts Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management6 days |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2006 |
CategoryPre-Jbsis Civil Limited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
||
Case Cycle Time583 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE FILE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GC 68152 AND STANDING ORDER BCSC 2006-SO-05 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: NCE | |
July 23, 2007 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: CLL | |
July 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Desc: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Desc2: CONT'D FROM 4/20/07 STATUS OF SERVICE Desc3: **$20 CONTINUANCE FEE PD BY PLNTFF** Notice Date: 2007-04-20 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 937 - OFF-CALENDAR/DISMISSED PER PLTF Disp Clerk: LBC Filing Clerk: CLL Judge: Roberts, Barbara L |
|
April 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice CONTINUANCE FEE PD BY MENDELSON LAW GROUP CK# 004956 Fee Type: CK Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Receipt Number: 388966 Fee Amount: 20.00 Entry Clerk: CLL 451 - $20.00 |
|
April 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Desc: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Disp Code: 342 - HEARD IN PART-CONT FOR FURTH HRG Disp Clerk: JMN Filing Clerk: JMS Judge: Roberts, Barbara L |
|
April 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONT'D FROM 4/20/07 STATUS OF SERVICE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JMN |
|
April 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT [P] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JMS |
|
January 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JMS |
|
December 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet COVER SHEET [CIVIL] Case Category Code: 09 Remedies: (M) # c/a: 5 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JMS |
|
December 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed - 30 Day Summons Issued - Under 10K COMPLAINT FILED - 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED (UNDER 10K) Fee Type: CK Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Receipt Number: 375900 Fee Amount: 180.00 Entry Clerk: JMS 444 - $180.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.