Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bulmer, Patrick, filed a(n) Pre-Jbsis Civil Limited case represented by Pro Per, against Miller, Ronald L, represented by Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Roberts, Barbara presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRoberts, Barbara Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryPre-Jbsis Civil Limited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time525 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE FILE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GC 68152 AND STANDING ORDER BCSC 2006-SO-05 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: NCE | |
April 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Desc: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Disp Code: 937 - OFF-CALENDAR/DISMISSAL FILED Disp Clerk: SWB Filing Clerk: SWB Judge: Roberts, Barbara L |
|
April 13, 2007 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON RONALD L MILLER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB | |
April 03, 2007 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB | |
March 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: NTC OF PROOF OF MAILING COPY OF ORDR GRNTNG MTN TO CHANGE VENUE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: CLL |
|
March 26, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CHANGE VENUE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: CLL | |
March 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Motion hearings - Predispo Desc: MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE BY DEFENDANT Desc2: *CONT FROM 02/23/07 Disp Code: 340 - GRANTED Disp Clerk: CLL Filing Clerk: VLA Judge: Roberts, Barbara L |
|
March 19, 2007 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF NTC OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY PHONE FOR MTN TO CHANGE VENUE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JMN | |
March 19, 2007 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF REPLY MEMO IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO CHANGE VENUE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JMN | |
March 16, 2007 | Docket Event | REPLY MEMO IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CHANGE VENUE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.