Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Dupree, Clifford G, filed a(n) (42) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) case represented by Driscol, Al ^^^, against Carlson, Linda M, represented by Ward, William A, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management177 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
Category(42) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) |
Time To Trial628 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions569 days |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
||
Case Cycle Time1227 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Desc: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Desc2: STATUS OF JUDGMENT Notice Date: 2010-03-24 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 937 - OFF-CALENDAR; STIP 4 FINAL JGMT ENTERED Disp Clerk: JMS Filing Clerk: MMC Judge: Roberts, Barbara L |
|
April 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order STIP AND ORDER FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT AND JUDGMENT #6605 Fee Type: CK Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Receipt Number: 521766 Fee Amount: 20.00 Entry Clerk: JMS 451 - $20.00 |
|
March 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS OF JUDGMENT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMC |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Judgment INTERLOCUTORY JUDGMENT OF PARTITION OF REAL PROPERTY Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JMS |
|
September 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Desc: COURT TRIAL Desc2: *2ND DAY Disp Code: 242 - SPLIT INTERLOCUTORY JUDGMENT Disp Clerk: VLA Filing Clerk: VLA Judge: Roberts, Barbara L |
|
September 23, 2008 | Docket Event | RECEIPT FOR EXHIBITS Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: VLA | |
September 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Desc: COURT TRIAL Notice Date: 2008-02-22 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 905 - CONTINUED TO 1:30 PM; TIME EST REDUCED Disp Clerk: VLA Filing Clerk: JMN Judge: Roberts, Barbara L |
|
September 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Desc: COURT TRIAL Disp Code: 342 - HEARD IN PART-CONT FOR FURTH HRG Disp Clerk: VLA Filing Clerk: VLA Judge: Roberts, Barbara L |
|
September 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
Brief TRIAL BRIEF OF [P] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JMN |
|
September 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
Brief TRIAL BRIEF OF [D] LINDA M CARLSON Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.