Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gcfs, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Hushing-Kline, Brighton, against Mccartney, Melody, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management115 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2006 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions112 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time3444 days |
Memorandum of Costs-After Judgment
Date: May 31, 2016Notice of Renewal of Judgment
Date: May 31, 2016Application For And Renewal of Judgment (EJ-190)
Date: May 31, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs-After Judgment | |
September 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service By Mail; Notice of Renewal of Judgment |
|
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs-After Judgment | |
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Renewal of Judgment issued |
|
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event | Application For And Renewal of Judgment (EJ-190) | |
August 13, 2015 | Docket Event | WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: CLL | |
April 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs-After Judgment MEMO OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT FILED COSTS $269.00 INTEREST $4037.98 CREDIT $250.0 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SLG |
|
February 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs-After Judgment MEMO OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT FILED COSTS $164.00 INTEREST $3963.47CREDIT $250.00 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: CLL |
|
February 13, 2015 | Docket Event | WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED - BUTTE CK# 43067 Fee Type: CK Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Receipt Number: 719251 Fee Amount: 25.00 Entry Clerk: CLL 542 - $25.00 | |
January 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs-After Judgment MEMO OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT FILED COSTS $164.00 INTEREST $2384.68 CREDIT $250.0 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.