Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Azevedo, Karen, Miller, Thomas, filed a(n) Pre-Jbsis Civil Unlimited case represented by Sorrells, Adam, against Bushard, Paul, represented by Jacobs, Douglas B, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Thomas W. Kelly presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas W. Kelly Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management176 days |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2006 |
CategoryPre-Jbsis Civil Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions403 days |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
||
Case Cycle Time1936 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2012 | Docket Event | CASE FILE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GC 68152 AND STANDING ORDER BCSC 2006-SO-05 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMC | |
March 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Desc: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Desc2: RE DISMISSAL Disp Code: 937 - OFF-CALENDAR Disp Clerk: LBC Filing Clerk: SWB Judge: Kelly, Thomas W |
|
March 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial - Long Cause Desc: JURY TRIAL - LONG CAUSE Disp Code: 947 - VACATED Disp Clerk: SWB Filing Clerk: VLA Judge: Kelly, Thomas W |
|
March 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness Conference Desc: TRIAL READINESS CONFERENCE Desc2: 4 DAY EST Desc3: PLNTF'S JURY Disp Code: 937 - OFF-CALENDAR Disp Clerk: SWB Filing Clerk: VLA Judge: Kelly, Thomas W |
|
February 25, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: LBC | |
February 14, 2008 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: LBC | |
February 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference Desc: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - CIVIL Desc2: CONT'D FROM 11/30/07 Disp Code: 365 - SETTLED AT MSC;TDS VACATED;DISM FCMC SET Disp Clerk: SWB Filing Clerk: JMN Judge: Howell, Steven J |
|
February 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information SIGNED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT;ENCLOSED W/ JUDGES NOTES:COPIES PROVIDED TO COUNSEL/PARTIES Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO ENTER PARTIAL DISMISSAL AS TO NSC38233 COMPLAINT W/PREJ Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: LBC | |
January 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Change of Address CHANGE OF ATTY ADDRESS FOR PLTF Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.