Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Triad Financial Corporation, filed a(n) Pre-Jbsis Civil Limited case represented by Booska, Steven A, against Mata, Daisy J, Mata, Jose T, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management120 days |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2006 |
CategoryPre-Jbsis Civil Limited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time1933 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2012 | Docket Event | CASE FILE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GC 68152 AND STANDING ORDER BCSC 2006-SO-05 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMC | |
June 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Desc: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Desc2: CONT'D FROM 4/20/07 Notice Date: 2007-04-20 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 937 - OFF-CALENDAR/DISMISSAL FILED Disp Clerk: SWB Filing Clerk: JMN Judge: Roberts, Barbara L |
|
May 07, 2007 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB | |
April 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Desc: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Disp Code: 342 - HEARD IN PART-CONT FOR FURTH HRG Disp Clerk: JMN Filing Clerk: MMC Judge: Roberts, Barbara L |
|
April 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONT'D FROM 4/20/07 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JMN |
|
March 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FOR PLTF Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB |
|
March 19, 2007 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON JOSE T MATA Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB | |
January 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
Legacy Service Information Name: MATA, JOSE T PartyId: 138880_2_200_2 Service Type: SUB Summons Date: 2007-01-22 00:00:00.0000000 |
|
January 22, 2007 | Docket Event | Substituted | |
December 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference NTC OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.