Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Longstreet, Brent M, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2008 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedMarch 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 12, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Destroyed | |
September 12, 2008 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
September 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Further Proceedings | |
September 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Date of Payment | |
September 11, 2008 | Docket Event | DMV Failure to Appear Release | |
September 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Muni Stat Plea | |
May 29, 2008 | Docket Event | DMV Failure to Appear Abstract | |
May 29, 2008 | Docket Event | DMV Hold | |
May 28, 2008 | Docket Event | Civil Assessment Failure To Appear | |
May 13, 2008 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear Letter |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.