Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Eldridge, Jack William, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Meredith, Lynne R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMeredith, Lynne R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2008 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
August 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Dismissed | |
August 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
August 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Meredith, Lynne R |
|
August 21, 2019 | Docket Event | DMV Failure to Appear Release | |
August 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Arraignment Held | |
January 22, 2008 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear Letter | |
January 07, 2008 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear | |
January 07, 2008 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
December 11, 2007 | Docket Event | Citation: Unsigned, Accident, or CHP Fixit |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.