Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Perez, Diana Leigh, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2008 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedFebruary 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Destroyed | |
May 22, 2008 | Docket Event | Abstract | |
May 21, 2008 | Docket Event | Bail Forfeiture | |
May 21, 2008 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
May 20, 2008 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear Letter | |
May 06, 2008 | Docket Event | Date of Payment | |
May 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear | |
February 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
February 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Traffic School Referral | |
January 02, 2008 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.