Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Collins, Ike, Morris, Eva Mae, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Wilson, Gary E, against Collins, Beola, Collins, Ike, Collins, J C, Mathis, Lara L, Parker, Roy, (total of 8) See All represented by Di Duca Law, Wilson, Gary E, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Roberts, Barbara presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRoberts, Barbara Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management92 days |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2004 |
Category(26) Unlimited Other Real Property |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions242 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Case Cycle Time1408 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Desc: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Desc2: CONT'D FROM 05/02/08 Notice Date: 2008-05-02 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 399 - FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED IN OPEN COURT Disp Clerk: VLA Filing Clerk: JMS Judge: Roberts, Barbara L |
|
November 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Judgment FINAL JUDGMENT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: VLA |
|
November 06, 2008 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: VLA | |
November 06, 2008 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF RE STATUS OF CASE FOR PLTF/X-DEFT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB | |
August 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Change of Address CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FROM BENEDICT C DIDUCA TO DIDUCA STEARNS, PC Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KLD |
|
May 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: NTC OF PROOF OF MAILING 05/23/08 MINUTE ORDER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JMS |
|
May 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion hearings - Predispo Desc: REFEREE MTN ORDER CONF SALE REAL Desc2: PROPERTY Disp Code: 340 - GRANTED Disp Clerk: JMS Filing Clerk: MMC Judge: Roberts, Barbara L |
|
May 08, 2008 | Docket Event | SANCTIONS (Fasttrack) RECEIVED FROM GARY WILSON CK 12634 Fee Type: CK Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Receipt Number: 433417 Fee Amount: 100.00 Entry Clerk: SWB 293 - $100.00 | |
May 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC MTN FOR ORDER CONFIRM SALE REAL PROP **SUBMITTED BY CT APPT REFEREE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMC |
|
May 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL TIMOTHY FERRIS SUPP MTN ORDER CONF SALE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.