Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bates, Gary Alan, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management100 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2004 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions524 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time2114 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE FILE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GC 68152 AND STANDING ORDER BCSC 2006-SO-05 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMC | |
July 17, 2006 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial - Long Cause Desc: JURY TRIAL - LONG CAUSE Disp Code: 364 - SETTLED Disp Clerk: JMN Filing Clerk: MMC Judge: Roberts, Barbara L |
|
July 14, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AS TO CMPLT & POS Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JMN | |
July 14, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AS TO X-CMPLT OF F COX & PROOF OF SERVICE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JMN | |
July 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Desc: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Desc2: CONT'D FROM 07/07/06 FOR DISMISSAL OF Desc3: BATES CROSS COMPLAINT, IF REC'D OFF-CAL Notice Date: 2006-07-10 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 937 - OFF-CALENDAR--DISMISSAL FILED Disp Clerk: JMN Filing Clerk: JMS Judge: Roberts, Barbara L |
|
July 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness Conference Desc: TRIAL READINESS CONFERENCE Desc2: 7 DAYS Desc3: DEFT JURY Disp Code: 364 - SETTLED Disp Clerk: JMN Filing Clerk: MMC Judge: Roberts, Barbara L |
|
July 10, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL OF X-CMPLT OF G BATES & PROOF OF SERVICE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JMN | |
July 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial - Long Cause Desc: JURY TRIAL - LONG CAUSE Desc2: DEF JURY Disp Code: 906 - CONTINUED TO 07/17/06 Disp Clerk: MMC Filing Clerk: JMS Judge: Howell, Steven J |
|
July 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONT'D FROM 07/07/06 FOR DISMISSAL OF Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JMS |
|
July 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Desc: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Desc2: RE: DISMISSAL OF CROSS-COMPLAINT Notice Date: 2006-06-12 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 905 - CONTINUED TO 07/14/06 Disp Clerk: JMS Filing Clerk: SLG Judge: Roberts, Barbara L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.