Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Butte County Credit Bureau, filed a(n) Pre-Jbsis Civil Limited case represented by Selby, Joseph L, against Baxter, Linda A, Baxter, Matthew L, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Scott, William presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeScott, William Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management216 days |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2004 |
CategoryPre-Jbsis Civil Limited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions114 days |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
||
Case Cycle Time2880 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order of Examination Desc: APPEARANCE & EXAMINATION OF JMT DEBTOR Desc2: LINDA A BAXTER Desc3: CONT FROM 10/26/12 Disp Code: 383 - SWORN & EXCUSED FOR EXAMINATION Disp Clerk: JMS Filing Clerk: JMS Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
October 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order of Examination Desc: APPEARANCE & EXAMINATION OF JMT DEBTOR Desc2: LINDA A BAXTER Disp Code: 906 - CONTINUED TO 11/9/12 Disp Clerk: KLD Filing Clerk: SWB Judge: Glusman, Robert A |
|
September 28, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB | |
September 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney SUBST OF ATTY FOR PLTF; OLD ATTY: ALFRED W DRISCOLL III; NEW ATTY: JOSEPH L SELBY Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB |
|
September 27, 2012 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE APP AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE & EXAM RE LINDA A BAXTER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB | |
September 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL OF NON FOUND DILIGENCE FOR LINDA A BAXTER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB |
|
July 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Application and Order for Exam-Judgment Debtor APP & ORDER FOR APPEARANCE & EXAM OF JMT DEBTOR CK 41123 Fee Type: CK Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Receipt Number: 623513 Fee Amount: 60.00 Entry Clerk: SWB 450 - $60.00 |
|
March 08, 2006 | Docket Event | WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED PARTIALLY SATISFIED IN THE AMOUNT OF $1900.57 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB | |
July 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Desc: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Disp Code: 937 - OFF-CALENDAR/DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED Disp Clerk: LBC Filing Clerk: JEG Judge: Scott, William O |
|
May 03, 2005 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment - Issued ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED CK#30261 Fee Type: CK Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Receipt Number: 312779 Fee Amount: 7.00 Entry Clerk: SLG 43 - $7.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.