Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Collins, Beverly J, filed a(n) Pre-Jbsis Civil Limited case against Christman, Sheran Halvig, Kautz, Kevin A, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with William O. Scott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam O. Scott Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 15, 2004 |
CategoryPre-Jbsis Civil Limited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions61 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time161 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal NTC OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SLG |
|
May 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL OF DONALD D MICKEL, AUCTIONEER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JMD |
|
May 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information ACCOUNTING FROM SALE OF MOBILEHOME DECLARED ABANDONED, DISPOSITION OF MONEY REC'D AT SALE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JMD |
|
May 05, 2005 | Docket Event | DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SLG | |
May 05, 2005 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO ENTER PARTIAL DISMISSAL AS TO CIT GROUP/SALES FINANCING INC ONLY Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SLG | |
March 21, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PUBLIC SALE OF ABANDONED MOBILEHOME Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SLG | |
March 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information INVENTORY OF CONTENTS OF MOBILEHOME JUDICIALLY DECLARED TO BE ABANDONED Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SLG |
|
February 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
Petition Hearing Desc: PETITION FOR JUDICIAL DECLARATION OF Desc2: ABANDONMENT OF MOBILEHOME Disp Code: 340 - JMT GRANTED AS PRAY-JMT SIGNED IN COURT Disp Clerk: CLL Filing Clerk: JMD Judge: Scott, William O |
|
February 14, 2005 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT (CIVIL) ENTERED Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: CLL | |
January 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL BY JANICE WOLFE RE ABANDONED MOBILEHOME Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SLG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.