Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hector, David M, Woods, Maralyn Kay, filed a(n) Pre-Jbsis Civil Unlimited case represented by Driscol, Alfred W, Iii, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Kelly, Thomas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKelly, Thomas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management101 days |
Filing DateDecember 14, 2004 |
CategoryPre-Jbsis Civil Unlimited |
Time To Trial559 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
||
Case Cycle Time3074 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF DESTRUCTION OF EXHIBITS Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JMS |
|
October 06, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE FILE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GC 68152 AND STANDING ORDER BCSC 2006-SO-05 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMC | |
February 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Exhibit Activity Exhibit Activity Number: [1] Entry Clerk: [NCE] Location ID: [] Exhibit Location: [DEFT EX MARKED 12/06 LOC IN SALLY PORT UNIT 4 SHELF D 2/22/10] Disposition Code/Date: [E06] [02/10/2010] Description: [RETURNED TO MEDA SEE] [PLTF EXHIBITS MARKED] ; Activity Clerk/Date: [KAD] [09/17/2009] Description: EXHIBITS LOCATED IN BOX 2 AT BCCH IN; OFFICE 17; , Activity Clerk/Date: [NCE] [10/27/2010] Description: RECEIVED FROM BCCH- LOCATED TO CHICO; EXHIBIT CLOSET; |
|
February 10, 2010 | Docket Event | RECEIPT FOR EXHIBITS; MEDA SEELY PICKED UP PLTFS EXHIBITS FOR PLTFS ATTY Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KAD | |
January 26, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR RETURN/DESTRUCTION OF EXHIBITS Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KAD | |
January 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: NTC OF PROOF OF MAILING ORDER FOR RETURN/DESTRUCTION OF EXHIBITS Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KAD |
|
January 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
Generic Hearing Desc: NTC OF PROOF OF MAILING Desc2: ORDER FOR RETURN/DESTRUCTION OF EXHIBITS Notice Date: 2010-01-26 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 996 - NOTICE SENT Disp Clerk: KAD Filing Clerk: KAD Judge: Howell, Steven J |
|
March 02, 2007 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JMN | |
February 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order STIP AND ORDER FURTHER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED STMT OF DECISION & JMT Fee Type: CK Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Receipt Number: 382318 Fee Amount: 20.00 Entry Clerk: JMN 451 - $20.00 |
|
February 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order STIP AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE OBJECTNS TO PROPOSED STMT OF DECISION & JMT Fee Type: CK Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Receipt Number: 380149 Fee Amount: 20.00 Entry Clerk: JMN 451 - $20.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.