Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The Trees Llc, A California Limited Liability Company, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Johnson, David S, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Judge, No Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudge, No Assigned Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 04, 2009 |
CategorySmall Claims In Co 12 Or Fewer |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time28 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Order, Filed | |
June 01, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment, Filed | |
May 28, 2009 | Docket Event | Small Claims Hearing | |
May 28, 2009 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
May 20, 2009 | Docket Event | Order re: Continuance | |
May 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Request for Continuance, Filed | |
May 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address, Filed | |
May 07, 2009 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Small Claims | |
May 04, 2009 | Docket Event | Authorization to Appear for Party, Filed | |
May 04, 2009 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Court, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.