Case Last Refreshed: 5 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Desmond Mcintosh, against Nicholas John Odonnell, represented by Jennifer A Archer, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts Santa Barbara - Figueroa - Criminal with Donna D Geck presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonna D Geck Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2010 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMarch 09, 2019 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Barbara - Figueroa - Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2018 | Action | Collections: Completed - Alliance One | |
November 06, 2018 | Action |
Order, Filed
Judge: Anderson, Clifford R, Iii |
|
May 08, 2018 | Action | Collections: Referred to Alliance One | |
January 26, 2011 | Action | FTP Notice, Mailed | |
December 06, 2010 | Action | DOJ Request - Initial | |
November 10, 2010 | Hearing |
Warrant Arraignment
Judge: Donna D Geck |
|
November 10, 2010 | Action | Arraigned on Complaint - First Plea Entered | |
November 10, 2010 | Action | Defense Counsel Concurred in Defendant's Plea or Admission | |
November 10, 2010 | Action | Charges and Direct Consequence of Plea | |
November 10, 2010 | Action | Court Found Plea Knowledgeable,Intelligently Made Voluntary |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.