Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Clawson, Debra, filed a(n) (43) Unlimited Other Petition (Not Spec) case against Jackson, Raymond, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2004 |
Category(43) Unlimited Other Petition (Not Spec) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time2110 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 01, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE FILE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GC 68152 AND STANDING ORDER BCSC 2006-SO-05 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMC | |
March 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
Trial Setting Conference Desc: TRAC --- [2 HRS] *SET FOR B01* Desc2: [P'S OSC FILED 01/14/04 RE: HARASS Desc3: REL'D ON TRAC 133428/133430/133431] Disp Code: 331 - OFF CALNDR-DISMISSED AT P'S REQ Disp Clerk: KKA Filing Clerk: SAS Judge: Patrick, William R |
|
January 24, 2005 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Harassment Desc: [P] OSC: HARASSMENT *CLETS* Desc2: *FILED 1/14/04* Disp Code: 363 - SET FOR TRAC 03/07/05 9 AM W/B01 Disp Clerk: KKA Filing Clerk: JAR Judge: Gilbert, Roger |
|
January 19, 2005 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (CH-120 CH-145) TO RAYMOND JACKSON ON 1/16/05 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JAR | |
January 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Court Issued OSC RE: HARASSMENT PP HD COPY FORWARDED TO BCSO Fee Type: W1 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 36.30 Entry Clerk: JAR 40 - $14.00 260 - $9.00 280 - $3.30 297 - $10.00 |
|
January 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
Request for Trial De Novo after Arbitration REQUEST AND ORDER FOR FREE SERVICE OF RESTRAIN- ING ORDER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JAR |
|
January 13, 2005 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL OF PTNR [P]RE NTC OF EXPARTE APP FOR ORDERS (RULE16) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JAR |
|
December 22, 2004 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information DENIAL OF TRO/HARASSMENT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAT |
|
December 22, 2004 | Docket Event |
Request to Waive Court Fees APP FOR ORDER WAIVING COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY PTNR Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JAR |
|
December 22, 2004 | Docket Event |
Order on Court Fee Waiver ORDER ON APP FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES/COSTS GRANTED TO PTNR *NO COPIES* Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JAR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.