Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Citation case against Poole, William Cletus, represented by Scott, Betrice A, in the jurisdiction of Spalding County, GA, . Spalding County, GA Superior Courts with Thacker, Josh W. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThacker, Josh W. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 12, 2021 |
CategoryCitation |
Last RefreshedNovember 03, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSpalding County, GA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
JURY/BENCH TRIAL
Judge: Thacker, Josh W. |
|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Motions, Calendar Call and Pleas | |
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ticket
Judge: Thacker, Josh W. |
|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Entry of Appearance | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Waiver of Arraignment | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Leave of Absence | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Ticket |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.