Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Montgomery Melva L, filed a(n) Dom Rel-Custody case represented by Montgomery Melva L -Pro Se, against Thompson Jaleia, in the jurisdiction of Newton County, GA, . Newton County, GA Superior Courts with JEFFREY L. FOSTER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJEFFREY L. FOSTER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 24, 2023 |
CategoryDom Rel-Custody |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationNewton County, GA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR HEARING | |
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | SERVICE | |
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
LETTER TO TENNESSEE PROCESS SERVICE |
|
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | RECEIPT | |
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS SHERIFF DEPARTMENT | |
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT PRO SE AFFIDAVIT |
|
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | PETITION | |
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | VERIFICATION | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER AFFIDAVIT OF POVERTY NOT APPROVED / LETTER FROM CLERK /AFFIDAVIT OF POVERTY / FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.