Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Newton County, GA, . Newton County, GA Superior Courts with JEFFREY L. FOSTER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJEFFREY L. FOSTER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2022 |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationNewton County, GA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
DISPOSITION DISMISSAL OF TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE |
|
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER CONTINUANCE ORDER (TRANSMITTED TO THE GEORGIA PROTECTIVE ORDER REGISTRY) |
|
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION THOMAS - EMERGENCY EX PARTE MOTION TO DISMISS FAMILY VIOLENCE EX PARTE PROTECTIVE ORDER |
|
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
ANSWER Thomas Answer to TPO |
|
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | SERVICE | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
CALENDAR FAMILY VIOLENCE - TPO |
|
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER FAMILY VIOLENCE EX PARTE PROTECTIVE ORDER |
|
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.