Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Sirjue Michael Egbert, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Sirjue Michael Egbert -Pro Se, against Benjamin Rosemarie Elizabeth, Sirjue Rosemarie Elizabeth, represented by Benjamin Rosemarie Elizabeth -Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Newton County, GA, . Newton County, GA Superior Courts with JOHN M OTT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJOHN M OTT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2022 |
CategoryDissolution/Divorce/Seperate Maintenance |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNewton County, GA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
DISPOSITION FINAL JUDGMENT AND DECREE OF DIVORCE |
|
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
CALENDAR DIVORCE - FINAL HEARING |
|
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing 04/25/2022 | |
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR HEARING | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE INITIATION FORM | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
REPORT OF DIVORCE MAILED 4/29/2022 |
|
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER FINAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.