Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Bishop Mitchell, filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case represented by Evans John Esq, against Devane Sara, Devane Sarah, represented by Wright Crystal S, Wright Crystal, in the jurisdiction of Newton County, GA, . Newton County, GA Superior Courts with JEFFREY L. FOSTER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJEFFREY L. FOSTER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2022 |
CategoryModification Of Custody/Parenting Time/Visitation |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNewton County, GA |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Leave of absence | |
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS - ATTORNEY WRIGHT | |
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
LEAVE OF ABSENCE Amended Leave of Absence |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event | LEAVE OF ABSENCE | |
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event | LEAVE OF ABSENCE | |
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Entry of Appearance.GAL | |
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
ANSWER Amended Answer |
|
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING SAFETY PLAN | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer to Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.