Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Newton County, GA, . Newton County, GA Superior Courts with W. KENDALL WYNNE JR. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeW. KENDALL WYNNE JR. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2022 |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationNewton County, GA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION | |
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE | |
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event | CALENDAR | |
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event | RULE NISI - 6/30/2022 AT 9:30AM | |
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR HEARING | |
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION | |
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PUBLICATION OF DIVORCE MAILED A COPY WITH $80.00 MONEY ORDER |
|
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING |
|
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER Service by Publication |
|
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.