Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Gentle Hubert, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Williams Matthew, against John Doe, Xyz Corps 1-2, First Source Heating And Air Llc, 1St Source Heating And Air Llc, Compton Micah, (total of 5) See All represented by Castilla Hilliard V., Hurst Matthew J., Castilla Hilliard, in the jurisdiction of Newton County, GA, . Newton County, GA Superior Courts with CHEVEDA D. MCCAMY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCHEVEDA D. MCCAMY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 12, 2021 |
CategoryAutomobile Tort |
Last RefreshedFebruary 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNewton County, GA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
RULE 5.2 CERTIFICATE RULE 5.2 COS FOR DISCOVERY REQUESTS [COMPTON MICAH TO PLAINTIFF] |
|
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
RULE 5.2 CERTIFICATE DEFENDANT MICAH COMPTON'S RULE 5.2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY MATERIAL |
|
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
ANSWER MICAH COMPTON'S FIRST AMENDED ANSWER AND JURY DEMAND |
|
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
RULE 5.2 CERTIFICATE Rule 5.2 COS for Discovery Responses [Mican Compton] |
|
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event | RECEIPT FOR OPEN DEFAULT FEE | |
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT COMPTON MICAH - RECEIPT # 840028 FOR 209 |
|
December 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer (1st Source Heating and Air, LLC) | |
December 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
ANSWER MICAH COMPTON'S SPECIAL ANSWER, JURY DEMAND, AND SHOWING THAT THEY HAVE PAID COSTS |
|
December 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer (First Source Heating and Air) | |
December 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
LEAVE OF ABSENCE Notice of Request for Leave of Absence [HVC] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.