Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Sheckler Stephanie, filed a(n) General Family - Family case represented by Sheckler Stephanie -Pro Se, against Denton Adam, in the jurisdiction of Newton County, GA, . Newton County, GA Superior Courts with LAYLA H. ZON presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLAYLA H. ZON Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 10, 2021 |
CategoryDom Rel-Family Violence |
Last RefreshedFebruary 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNewton County, GA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | CALENDAR | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
DISPOSITION DISMISSAL OF TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER |
|
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | SERVICE | |
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | CALENDAR | |
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND EX PARTE PROTECTIVE ORDER | |
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event | CALENDAR | |
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND EX PARTE PROTECTIVE ORDER | |
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER FAMILY VIOLENCE EX PARTE PROTECTIVE ORDER |
|
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER | |
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | CALENDAR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.