Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Barber Isabella, filed a(n) General Family - Family case represented by Barber Isabella -Pro Se, Newsome Emily M, against Allen Christian, represented by Johnson Melinda, in the jurisdiction of Newton County, GA, . Newton County, GA Superior Courts with LAYLA H. ZON presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLAYLA H. ZON Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 09, 2021 |
CategoryDom Rel-Family Violence |
Last RefreshedFebruary 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNewton County, GA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY: EMILY M NEWSOME IS ON LEAVE FROM: 3/7/2022 TO 3/9/2022 | |
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
EXHIBITS EXHIBIT LIST FROM HEARING HELD ON 12/01/2021 |
|
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER FAMILY VIOLENCE TWELVE MONTH PROTECTIVE ORDER |
|
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event | CONFLICT LETTER | |
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event | ENTRY OF APPEARANCE - ATTORNEY NEWSOME | |
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Entry of Appearance | |
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Leave of Absence | |
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE Amended Entry of Appearance |
|
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | CALENDAR | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.