Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Delk Patsy Gleaves, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case represented by Delk Patsy Gleaves -Pro Se, against Objectors, in the jurisdiction of Newton County, GA, . Newton County, GA Superior Courts with JEFFREY L. FOSTER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJEFFREY L. FOSTER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 14, 2021 |
CategoryName Change |
Last RefreshedFebruary 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNewton County, GA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
DISPOSITION FINAL ORDER CHANGING NAME OF ADULT |
|
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
CALENDAR NAME CHANGE - ADULT |
|
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing (02/07/2022 at 9 AM) and Certificate of Service | |
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR HEARING | |
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION | |
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE INITIATION FORM | |
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event | PETITION | |
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event | RECEIPT | |
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT PRO SE AFFIDAVIT |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event | VERIFICATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.