Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Greaney, Laurie Diane, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Tourtlotte, Sabrina M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTourtlotte, Sabrina M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 05, 2007 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedApril 06, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2026 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | DMV Failure to Appear Release on Dismissals | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Held | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Tourtlotte, Sabrina M |
|
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Dismissed | |
June 04, 2007 | Docket Event | DMV Hold | |
June 04, 2007 | Docket Event | DMV Failure to Appear Abstract | |
June 01, 2007 | Docket Event | Civil Assessment Failure To Appear | |
May 16, 2007 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear Letter |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.