Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Head, Denise, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Bonner, Darrell, Houseal, Monica, represented by Holt, John D., in the jurisdiction of Lowndes County, GA, . Lowndes County, GA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2022 |
CategoryDispossessory* |
Last RefreshedJuly 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLowndes County, GA |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Service Document
Date: December 28, 2022Answer Date
Date: January 03, 2023Hearing Notice Mailed
Date: January 05, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Entry of Appearance | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Cleveland, Elizabeth |
|
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Notice Mailed | |
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer Date | |
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Return to Court Service Document |
|
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Dispossessory | |
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer Due in 7 Days | |
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Dispossessory Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.