Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Budd Commercial Real Estate, Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Williams, Shekierra, in the jurisdiction of Lowndes County, GA, . Lowndes County, GA Superior Courts with Cleveland, Elizabeth presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCleveland, Elizabeth Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2022 |
CategoryDispossessory* |
Last RefreshedJanuary 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLowndes County, GA |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Service Document
Date: December 22, 2022Hearing Notice Mailed
Date: December 28, 2022Designation of Agent for Business Entity
Date: December 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Designation of Agent for Business Entity | |
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Cleveland, Elizabeth |
|
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Notice Mailed | |
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer Date | |
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Return to Court Service Document |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer Due in 7 Days | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Designation of Agent for Business Entity | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Dispossessory | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Dispossessory Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.