Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Klingenberg, Emma, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Klingenberg, Mackenzi, represented by Hicks, J. Randall, in the jurisdiction of Lowndes County, GA, . Lowndes County, GA Superior Courts with Cowart, Richard M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCowart, Richard M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 02, 2022 |
CategoryProtective Order* |
Last RefreshedJuly 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLowndes County, GA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Petition/Complaint
Date: December 02, 2022Order
Date: December 02, 2022Order
Date: December 20, 2022Return Sheriffs Service
Date: December 07, 2022Answer
Date: December 19, 2022Order
Date: January 10, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Dismissal of Temporary Protective Order |
|
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Cowart, Richard M. |
|
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for Continuance of Hearing and EX Parte Protective Order (Judge Cowart) | |
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Cowart, Richard M. |
|
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer to Petition Protective Order Answer to Peition For Temporary Protective Order |
|
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Klingenberg, Mackenzi - Service Return Sheriffs Service Mackenzi Klingenberg was personally served on 12/05/2022 |
|
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Petition/Complaint | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Order | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Service Sheriff's Return of Service 12/05/2022 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.