Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Bennett, Terry, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Adams, Chinissica, in the jurisdiction of Lowndes County, GA, . Lowndes County, GA Superior Courts with Cleveland, Elizabeth presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCleveland, Elizabeth Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 20, 2021 |
CategoryDispossessory* |
Last RefreshedJuly 15, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLowndes County, GA |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Answer Due in 7 Days
Date: October 22, 2021Answer Date
Date: October 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Hearing Judge: Parker, Joni |
|
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit for Writ of Execution | |
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Notice Mailed | |
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer Date | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer Due in 7 Days | |
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Dispossessory Service | |
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Dispossessory |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.