Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Forest Park Ga Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Bryant, Demetrius, in the jurisdiction of Lowndes County, GA, . Lowndes County, GA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 13, 2021 |
CategoryDispossessory* |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLowndes County, GA |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Answer Due in 7 Days
Date: October 14, 2021Answer Date
Date: October 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Hearing Judge: Cleveland, Elizabeth |
|
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Pending | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Notice Mailed | |
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer Date | |
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer Due in 7 Days | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Dispossessory | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Designation of Agent for Business Entity | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Dispossessory Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.